Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sattin, Aline, Sattin, Harvey, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Meyer, Jr., Esq., Andrew C, Thompson, Esq., William John, against Boston Breast Diagnostic Center Llc, Levin, M.D., Elsie, represented by Hilton, Esq., David Austin, John, Esq., Suela, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Maynard M. Kirpalani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaynard M. Kirpalani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Affidavit of Suela John Esq. in compliance w/Rule 13 (Rec'd .9/14/2018)
Date: September 17, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 12, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/12/2016 (SENT TO ATTORNEY)
Date: December 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 03/01/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Rosalind H Miller, Presiding
Judge: Miller, Rosalind H |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/17/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Rosalind H Miller, Presiding
Judge: Miller, Rosalind H |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Aline Sattin, Harvey Sattin's original complaint of All Claims Against Elsie Levin, M.D. and Boston Breast Diagnostic Center LLC are Dismissed with all Rights of Appeal Waived and with Each Party to Bear his/her/its Own Costs and Attorneys Fees . Applies To: Thompson, Esq., William John (Attorney) on behalf of Sattin, Aline, Sattin, Harvey (Plaintiff); Hilton, Esq., David Austin (Attorney) on behalf of Boston Breast Diagnostic Center LLC (Defendant); John, Esq., Suela (Attorney) on behalf of Levin, M.D., Elsie (Defendant) | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Boston Breast Diagnostic Center LLC: Dismissed by agreement of parties; SEE P#29.0 | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Levin, M.D., Elsie: Dismissed by agreement of parties; SEE P# 29.0 | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date William John Thompson, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Harvey Sattin | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date William John Thompson, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Aline Sattin | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a Trial Assignment Conference on November 8, 2018 the Court ORDERS: (1) Trial With Jury is Scheduled for March 1, 2021 at 9:00AM - First Case Out (9) For Good Cause, Final Trial Conference is Continued to February 17, 2021 at 2:00PM (10) Final Pretrial conference to be held October 7, 2020 at 2:00PM (11) Motion in Limine and Motions for Attorney Conducted Voir Dire to be Filed Pursuant to Rule 9A by February 12, 2021 (Kirpalani, J.) ns-cm Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference On Oct 7, 2020 at 2:00P.M. Sent On: 11/08/2018 14:42:58 | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled on: 11/08/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR Room 10 - 2:14:21 Hon. Maynard Kirpalani, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.