Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Larquin Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sayeg, Jr., Esq., Raymond, against Rodolfo Rodriguez A K A Rudy Rodriguez, represented by Hagstrom, Esq., Erik, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Maynard M. Kirpalani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaynard M. Kirpalani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Rule 9A list of documents filed. (rec'd 4/29/19)
Date: May 02, 2019Rule 9A notice of filing (rec'd 4/29/19)
Date: May 02, 2019ORDER: on Arbitration (dated 10/16/18) copy sent dl Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Date: October 22, 2018General correspondence regarding ----JOINT Status report and Discovery Schedule (FAXED)
Date: October 13, 2017Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: (rec'd 8/29/18)
Date: August 30, 2018Received from Plaintiff Larquin Corporation: Answer to the Counterclaim; (rec'd 9/28/17)
Date: October 02, 20173rd Party Complaint filed---Rodolfo Rodriguez a/k/a Rudy Rodriguez vs. Lorenzo Quinones
Date: August 07, 2017Answer of Lorenzo Quinones to the Third Party Complaint; (rec'd 9/28/17)
Date: October 02, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 12, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/12/2016 (SENT TO ATTORNEY)
Date: December 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of satisfaction of judgment filed by Plaintiff Larquin Corporation, satisfied in in full and withdrawing request for execution | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Sayeg, Jr., Esq., Raymond (Attorney) on behalf of Larquin Corporation (Plaintiff) | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: Judgment for defendant Lorenzo Quinones (see Judgment Confirming the Arbitration Award dated 6/27/19) copy sent dl | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - After review of the Addendum. the Clerk is to enter judgment on all counts. (dated 6/27/19) notice sent dl (#29.0): Other action taken Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Elaine MBuckley |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: judgment for 3rd party deft, Lorenzo Quinones (see Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award dated 6/27/19) copy sent dl Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Elaine MBuckley |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: against Rodolfo Rodriguez a/k/a Rudy Rodriguez (see Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award dated 6/27/19) copy sent dl | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Addendum to Award of Arbitrator Dated march 27, 2019 "I find for the Plaintiff, Larquin Corportion. I find the Plaintiff, Larquin Corporation actually performed the additional work pursuant to change orders and award them the sum of $45,513.00 plus interest as of March 27, 2019 to Larquin Corporation. Judgment shall also issue in favor of the Plaintiff, Larquin Corporation with respect to Defendant, Rudolfo Rodriguez's counterclaims and Defendant/Plaintiff in counterclaim shall recover nothing. I also find in favor of the Third Party Defendant Lorenzo Quinones with respect to the Third Party claim and Third Party Rudolfo Rodriguez shall recover nothing on his Third Party claim in this action . This award is in full settlement of all claims and counterclaims submitted. (rec'd 6/26/19) | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to confirm arbitration award - Upon review, the motion is (#29.0): ALLOWED (dated 5/6/19) notice sent dl Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Elaine MBuckley |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend date of nisi dismissal (#29.1): ALLOWED in part. The nisi deadline is extended to May 17, 2019. (dated 5/6/19) notice sent dl Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Elaine MBuckley |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. (rec'd 4/29/19) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.