Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dejean, Ritchell, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Milgram, Esq., Jack P, against Crown Building Maintenance, A Corporation,, represented by Maglio, Esq., David E, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Ritchell DeJean's original complaint against Crown Building Maintenance, a Corporation (d/b/a Able Building Maintenance Company) | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to compel (#4.0): ALLOWED pursuant to Rule 9A review, no opposition having been filed to the extent that the plaintiff, Ritchell DeJean shall respond to defendant's First Request for Production of Documents within 30 days of the entry of this order. (dated 7/10/17) notice sent dl | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing (rec'd 6/9/17) | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of notice. (rec'd 6/9/17) | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant(s) Crown Building Maintenance, a Corporation,(DBA: Able Building Maintenance Company) motion filed to compel responses from the plaintiff, Ritchell Dejean, to it's request fro production of documents. (rec'd 6/9/17) | |
February 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Pleading titled, notice of change of contact information, filed with the court on 02/18/2017, returned to David E Maglio, Esq. We can no longer make changes on attorney information. Please contact the BBO to make changes and they will update the system. | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Crown Building Maintenance, a Corporation,(DBA: Able Building Maintenance Company): Answer with claim for trial by jury; (received 1/11/2017) Applies To: Crown Building Maintenance, a Corporation,(DBA: Able Building Maintenance Company) (Defendant) | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David E Maglio, Esq. added for Defendant Crown Building Maintenance, a Corporation,(DBA: Able Building Maintenance Company) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.