Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Harwich Beach, Llc, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Curran, Jr., Esq., Joseph K, against Coastal Heritage Bank F K A S-Bank, represented by Bond, Esq., Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Diane C. Freniere presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane C. Freniere Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/11/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/19/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Harwich Beach, LLC's original complaint All parties waive their rights of notice and appeal, each party bearing their own costs and attorney's fees. | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a pretrial conference on June 7,2018 the Court ORDERS:All motions in limine be filed via 9A with the Court no later than September 7,2018 along with a joint updated witness list, any proposed voir dire, an agreed upon description of the case and an agreed upon exhibit list; Final Trial Conference is scheduled for Tuesday, September 11th, 2018 at 2:00pm for a hearing on motions in limine and all other pretrial matters; Trial is scheduled for Wednesday, September 19th, 2018 at 9:00am and is estimated to run 4 days (Hallal , J)(Dated;6/8/18) ns pl Judge: Hallal, Hon. Mark A
Judge: Mark AHallal |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 06/07/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mark A Hallal, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Hallal, Mark A |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on June 7, 2018 at 2:00P.M. Sent On: 04/30/2018 14:50:28 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned request a pre trial conference on May 1, 2018. (rec'd 4/2/18) Informed that this date would not work, suggested a new date in June. Applies To: Curran, Jr., Esq., Joseph K (Attorney) on behalf of Harwich Beach, LLC (Plaintiff) | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 04/13/2018 the complaint will be dismissed. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. William F
Judge: William FSullivan |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for clarification (#7.0): DENIED The Court's Order resolved only that the agreement required Coastal to indemnity Harwich, but denied summary judgment in all other respects. (dated 9/26/17) notice sent dl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.