Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A. Aadvantage, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldberg, Esq., David S, Langella, Esq., Ashley E, Moore, Esq., Ashley, against Mcgovern, Janine K, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Mark A. Hallal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Hallal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Execution Issued: mailed to Ashley Moore, Esq. of Goldberg & Oriel at 199 Wells Ave., Suite 209 in Newton, MA 02459 Execution Judgment Debtor: McGovern, Janine K Judgment Creditor: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 02/11/2020 Judgment Total: 60,609.97 Execution Subtotal: 60,609.97 Execution Total: 60,609.97 Judge: Hickey, Mary K
Judge: Mary KHickey |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Mark A Hallal Judgment For: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage Judgment Against: Janine K McGovern Terms of Judgment: Jdgmnt Date: 06/07/2018 Damages: Damage Amt: 60286.62 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 5.00 Other Costs: 43.35 Judgment Total: 60,609.97 | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Execution after one year (#16.0): ALLOWED Execution may issue. (dated 12/16/19) notice sent dl Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Moore, Esq., Ashley (Attorney) on behalf of Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage (Plaintiff) | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing Applies To: Moore, Esq., Ashley (Attorney) on behalf of Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage (Plaintiff) | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Moore, Esq., Ashley (Attorney) on behalf of Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage (Plaintiff) | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage's Motion for the issuance of an Execution after one (1) year. | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES: In the above action, the court after default of defendant, Janine K. McGovern assesses damages in the sum of $60,286.62 with statutory costs. Dated 5/8/2018. Notices mailed 6/7/2018 Judge: Hallal, Hon. Mark A
Judge: Mark AHallal |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Mark A Hallal Judgment For: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage Judgment Against: Janine K McGovern Terms of Judgment: Jdgmnt Date: 06/07/2018 Damages: Damage Amt: 60286.62 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 5.00 Other Costs: 43.35 Judgment Total: 60,609.97 (cs) | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Clarification / Correction of the docket: No. 6.0 - The Plaintiff requests a waiver of attorney's fees and interest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.