Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Parady, Roland, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Wozniak, Esq., John M, against Fastenal Company, represented by Deluca, Esq., Francesco A, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to the United States District Court filed by defendant (rec'd 1/9/17) Applies To: Fastenal Company (Defendant) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Francesco A. DeLuca, Esq. added for Defendant Fastenal Company | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Fastenal Company: Service made in hand; to Tom Lee, agent and person in charge at the time of service on 12/16/2016 at 3:52pm Applies To: Fastenal Company (Defendant) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/08/2016 | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John M Wozniak, Esq. added for Plaintiff Roland Parady |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.