Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arbella Mutual Insurance Co., filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Bonfiglio, Esq., Joseph P, against City Of Quincy, represented by Petkun, Esq., Janet S, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2016 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. (as subrogee of City of Quincy School Department), City of Quincy's interpleader complaint (Rec'd. 5/25/2018) Applies To: Petkun, Esq., Janet S (Attorney) on behalf of City of Quincy (Defendant); Bonfiglio, Esq., Joseph P (Attorney) on behalf of Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. (as subrogee of City of Quincy School Department) (Plaintiff) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant City of Quincy: Answer with claim for trial by jury; (received 1/19/2017) Applies To: City of Quincy (Defendant) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Janet S Petkun, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant City of Quincy | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant City of Quincy: Service made in hand; to Laura Power, secretary, person in charge at the time of service on 1/4/2017 at11:22am Applies To: City of Quincy (Defendant) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/07/2016 | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph P. Bonfiglio, Esq. added for Plaintiff Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. (as subrogee of City of Quincy School Department) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.