We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Roberts V Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Roberts, Florence, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mcelroy, Esq., Peter M, against Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc, represented by Cohen, Esq., Adam G, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Roberts, Florence v. Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc

Filing Date

February 03, 2015

Category

Torts

Last Refreshed

April 10, 2021

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Norfolk County, MA

Matter Type

Personal Injury

Parties for Roberts, Florence v. Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc

Plaintiffs

Roberts, Florence

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Mcelroy, Esq., Peter M

Defendants

Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc

Attorneys for Defendants

Cohen, Esq., Adam G

Case Events for Roberts, Florence v. Stop And Shop Supermarket Company Llc

Type Description
Docket Event Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. The parties further waive all rights of appeal and all other rights of recourse from this dismissal - recd 2/3/2015
Docket Event Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 2/17/2015 at 2:00 P.M.
Docket Event Case status changed to 'Needs discovery' at answer deadline review
Docket Event Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review
Docket Event Motion (P#6.0) There being no opposition, motion ALLOWED in that the Rule 15 filing deadline is extended to September 1, 2014; the deadline for completion of factual discovery is extended to December 15, 2014; the Rule 56 filing deadline is extended to January 15, 2015 and the case is placed on the February, 2015 pre-trial conference list. (Kenneth Fishman, Regional Administrative Justice) dated July 14, 2014 Notices mailed 7/16/2014
Docket Event Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A.
Docket Event Plaintiff's memorandum in support of motion for speedy trial - recd 7/10/2014
Docket Event Plaintiff's motion for speedy trial - recd 7/10/2014
Docket Event Uniform Counsel Certification filed by Defendant's The Stop & Shop Company, attorney Adam G. Cohen
Docket Event ANSWER and Jury Claim of Defendant; The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC (Rec.'d 6/23/14) - Tracking sent to attorney
See all events