Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Kaye, Esq., Daniel Philip, against Two Cellular Telephones, One Hundred Nine Dollars Usc, 1995 Nissan Maxima, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice) dated March 17, 2008 | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#9.0) ALLOWED (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice) dated March 17, 2008 Notices mailed 3/18/2008 | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | List of documents | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of no opposition | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of motion for entry of default judgement | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Commonwealth's motion for entry of default judgement | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of request for default for entry of default pursuant to MRCP 55a | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | The deft Eladio Perez is defaulted under 55a for failure to answer ns | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | The deft Ramon Martinez is defaulted under 55a failure to answer ns | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Ramon Martinez and Eladio Perez by Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.