Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Keefe, Andrew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pasquale, Esq., Gregg J, against Rees, William, Rees, David, represented by Schranze, Esq., Bernard W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs (rec'd 1/20/09) | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 2/20/2009 (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice)ns | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Pre-trial ORDER:After a pretrial was scheduled for January 14,2009 the Court ORDERS:Case Settled, closing papers to be filed within 30 days of the date of this order(Garsh,J)(dated;1/15/09)ns | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11.0) allowed. no opposition. thirty days to respond (Sanders,J.) Notices mailed 11/12/08 | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10.0) ALLOWED. The pre-trial conference is continued to January 14, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. (Samders,J.) Notices mailed 11/12/08 | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Document List | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Defendants David Rees Et Al's MOTION to compel production of documents: Request #7 by the Plff. | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint motion to continue pre-trial conference scheduled for November 12, 2008 to January 14, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. (fax) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.