Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Kaye, Esq., Daniel Philip, against Three Cellular Telephones, One Hundred Thirty Dollars Usc, 1999 Lexus Rx300, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b2) by court before (Connors,J.) It is ordered that one 1999 Lexus RX 300 VIN: JT6HF10UTX0027857, three cellular phones and $130.00 dollars,United StatesCurrency be forfeited to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, for official use or distribution through the office of the D.A. for the Norfolk District, in accordance with Massachusetts General Laws,Chapter 94C, Section 47 (Connors,J.) (Dated 4/29/08) Certcopies mailed 4/30/08 | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#9.0) ALLOWED (Connors,J.)(Dated 4/29/08) Notices mailed 4/30/2008 | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | List of documents | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A and no opposition. | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Daniel Kaye, ADA in support of Motion for entry of Default Judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(b) | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Commonwealth's MOTION for entry of default judgment under Rule 55(b) | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Putative Interest Parties Henry Nivar, Luis Torres-Robles andAnalis Peguero are defaulted pursuant to Rule 55(a) ns | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Daniel Kaye, A.D.A. | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Henry Nivar, Luis Torres-Robles, and Analis Peguero by Commonwealth of Massachusetts | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | re: Analis Peguero, cert. mail return receipt attached |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.