Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
New England Finish Systems Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bardanis, Esq., Emanuel Nickolaos, against State Street Corporation, Ssb Realty Inc, Ssb Realty Llc, represented by Morgan, Esq., Brian Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) with prejudice and without costs | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for SSB Realty LLC, SSB Realty, Inc. and State Stree Corporation to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to and including 10/1/2008 | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for defendants to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to and including 9/15/2008 | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for SSB Realty LLC, SSB Realty Inc, and State Street Corporation to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to and including 8/1/2008 | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for SSB Realty LLC SSB Realty Inc and State Street Corporation to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to and including 6/15/2008 (rec'd 4/17/08) | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Pleading, withdrawal of appearance of Samer Obeid, returned to Samer Obeid, Esq.: We must have notice of appearance of an individual attorney; not just the firm | |
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for Defts' to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to and including 4/15/2008 | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: SSB Realty LLC(Defendant), in hand to Maria Depina on 1/15/08 | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: SSB Realty Inc(Defendant), in hand to Maria Depina, agent on 1/15/08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.