Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green, Richard, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Amaral, Jr., Esq., Edward Lopes, against Cammarata, Nina, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2008 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Pleading, Stipulation of Dismissal, returned to Edward L Amaral Jr, Esq.: Deft. Nina Cammarata is in default, therefore, she cannot sign the Stipulation of Dismissal. A 9A or Assented to Motion to vacate Default would be required; or, as you are Mr. Green's attorney, you may file a Voluntary Dismissal. | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs damage assessment scheduled' at answer deadline review | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Default re: Nina Cammarata is defaulted(no answer by 1-88 deadline); Judgment of dismissal is to enter unless a Motion for assessment of damages and default judgment is filed and heard within 90 days (Connors, J.) cs | |
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Nina Cammarata(Defendant) by leaving at the L & U place of abode of the Defendant on 1/9/2008 | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Court received letter from Nina Cammarata sent to Attorney Amaral and Attorney Glynn requesting an extension to hire attorney | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent: fast track to plffs attorney | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.