Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services Na Fka, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Wiener, Esq., Stephen A., against Ferguson, John J, represented by Thomsen, Esq., Jocelyn A, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT as a result of Status: Clerk Follow UP: It is Hereby Ordered and Adjudged: That all remaining claims be dismissed without prejudice (Sanders, J.) Copies mailed 9/19/2008 | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of Sept. 12, 2008 (Sanders, J.) cs | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list fo documents | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion to confirm aribitration award for judgement | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: (summons) John J Ferguson(Defendant) served on 1/15/2008 by leaving at l & u | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER of John J Ferguson(Defendant) to complaint - X Track notice sent to defendant's attorney | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent:X track to plffs attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.