Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services Na Fka, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Wiener, Esq., Stephen A., against Antoine, Louis J., in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Pleading, Voluntary Dismissal, returned to Stephen A Wiener, Esq., for/or FIA Card Services NA fka.: This case was transferred to Suffolk Superior Court | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5.0) ALLOWED (Patrick F. Brady, Associate Justice) dated 7/22/08. Notices mailed 7/24/2008 | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Rule 9A List of documents | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's motion to transfer to Suffolk Superior Court | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Louis J. Antoine served on 3/6/2008 by leaving at l &u (rcvd 3/17/2008) | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Louis J Antoine(Defendant) by leaving at the L & U place of abode of the Defendant on 1/18/2008 | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent: X track to plffs attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.