Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services Na Fka, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Wiener, Esq., Stephen A., against Bailey, Gene P, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of April 30, 2010 (Sanders, R.A.J.) cs | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Suggestion of bankruptcy by Defendant, Gene P Bailey | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | The deft Gene P Bailey is defaulted under 55a for failure to answer ns | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Gene P Bailey by FIA Card Services NA fka | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Gene P Bailey(Defendant) by leaving at the L & U place of abode of the Defendant on 1/16/2008 | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent: X track to plffs attorney | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.