Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cacv Of Colorado Llc, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Cambece, Esq., James A, Desrochers, Esq., Gina Marie, against Tan, Qiu, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2007 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Received Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment from CACV representative | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Execution returned satisfied in full | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Execution issued to Gina M. Desrochers, Esq J.A. Cambece Law Offices P.C. 200 Cummings Center, suite 173D Beverly, MA 01915 re;Qiu Tan damages $10,013.71;costs $315.79;interest to date of execution $6,562.13 (dated;4/29/14) | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11.0) ALLOWED (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice) dated March 12, 2014 Notices mailed 3/13/2014 | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's affidavit in support of its motion to issue execution after one year (rec'd 2/20/14) | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's motion to issue execution after one year (rec'd 2/20/14) | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD; It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff CACV of Colorado LLC recover of the Defendant Qui M. Tan the sum of $9,021.40 with interest from December 13, 2007 and its costs of action. (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice). Copies mailed 11/13/2008 | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9.0) ALLOWED (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice) Notices mailed 11/13/2008 | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | List of documents | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.