Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cacv Of Colorado Llc, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Cambece, Esq., James A, against Morse, Marjorie, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Execution issued to: Michael A. Lovell, J.A. Cambece Law Office 8 Bourbon Street, Peabody, Ma. 01960 re: Marjorie Morse- damages: 18,420.17; cost: 331.35; interest to date of execution: 645.69 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT confirming arbitration award-This came on before (Connor,J.) on pllff's motion for arbitration award and it is ordered and adjudged that the plff, CACV of Colorado, LLC recover of the deft, Marjorie Morse damages in the amount of $18,106.45 plus statitpry interest thereon from December 13,2007 and their costs of action Cert copies mailed 2/5/08 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#4.0) ALLOWED (Connor,J.) Notices mailed 2/5/2008 | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Marjorie Morse is defaulted pursuant to rule 55a for failure to file a responsive pleading | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Marjorie Morse by CACV of Colorado LLC | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of filing | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for hearing | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's motion to confirm arbitration award for judgement | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: in hand to Marjorie Morse(Defendant)-served on 1/8/08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.