Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cacv Of Colorado Llc, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Cambece, Esq., James A, against Parker, John, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Execution returned: notice of satisfaction of judgment satisfied in full | |
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Execution issued to: Michael A. Lovell, J.A. Cambece Law Office Eight Bourbon Street, Peabody,Ma. 0l960 re: John Parker damages: 22,672.87; cost: 317.51; interest to date of execution: 977.64 | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATORS AWARD; It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff CACV of Colororado, LLC recover of the Defendant John Parker, the sum of $22,221.05 plus interest at the statutory rate of 12% from 12/13/07 and its costs of action. (John P. Connor, Jr., Associate Justice) Copies mailed 2/14/2008 | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#5.0) ALLOWED (John P. Connor, Jr., Associate Justice) Notices mailed 2/14/2008 | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | List of documents | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for hearing | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of filing | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion to confirm arbitration award | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | John Parker defaulted pursuant to Rule 55(a) for failure to answer ns |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.