Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kollie, Jeannie Morandus, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee, represented by Corrigan, Esq., Joseph P, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2008 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on Defendant's12b motion to dismiss before (Connors,J.) It is OLRDERED and ADJUDGED that the complaint of plff Jeannie Morandus Kollie is hereby dismissed with prejudice against deft, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. as Trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Seriers 2005-A11, and the deft frecovers its costs of action Cert opies mailed 5/19,08 | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#4.0) After hearing, Motion ALLOWED (Connors,Justice) dated 5/14/08 Notices mailed 5/14/2008 | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear on 5/14/2008 for a hearing on Deft's motion to dismiss with prejudice pur to MRCP 12b(3)(4)(6)(p#4.0) before Judge Connors at 2:00pm | |
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs status review' at service deadline review | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Copies of P#4.2 and 4.3 to Judge Brady | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee by certified mail green card attached served 12/13/08(rec'd12/19/07) | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Rule 9a index of documents | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of filing of documents | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Deft's Opposition to plff's request for prliminary injunction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.