Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mccreary, Janet E, Mccreary, Janet P, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Carter, Esq., Jeremy M, Deyoung, Esq., Steven Scott, Sloane, Esq., Adam Benjamin, against Wilkinson, Kenneth G, represented by Merberg, Esq., James Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Maynard M. Kirpalani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaynard M. Kirpalani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 28, 2021ANSWER with COUNTERCLAIM received from Defendant Wilkinson, Kenneth G
Date: December 01, 2021Affidavit of Kenneth Wilkinson
Date: June 26, 2023Affidavit of Janet E. McCreary
Date: June 26, 2023Plaintiff Janet E McCreary's Notice of Filing
Date: June 26, 2023Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C
Date: June 28, 2023Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: September 22, 2023Plaintiff Janet E McCreary's Motion to Allow Deposition to Take Place Via Zoom
Date: June 26, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After Final Pre-Trial Conference, Trial is scheduled to begin on May 13, 2024. The parties shall be notified of a Final Trial Conference, which shall be held in March or April 2024 by the Trial Judge. If Attorney Merberg is still out of state, the Final Trial Conference may be held by Zoom. Judge: Hogan, Hon. Maureen
Judge: Hogan, Maureen |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/28/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Trial 5/13/2024 to be scheduled Hon. Maureen Hogan, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Jeremy M Carter, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant James Michael Merberg, Esq., Private Counsel
Judge: Hogan, Maureen |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on motion to (#7.0): Allow Deposition to Take Place via Zoom DENIED The plaintiffs having filed suit in Nantucket County, and defendant's counsel agreeing to conduct the deposition in Boston, the motion is denied. Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Kenneth Wilkinson | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Deposition to Take Place Via Zoom filed by Kenneth G Wilkinson | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Janet E. McCreary | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Janet E McCreary's Notice of Filing | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Janet E McCreary's Motion to Allow Deposition to Take Place Via Zoom |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.