Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mcisaac, Elizabeth A, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Crowley, Jr., Esq., James C, Manoog, Iii, Esq., John Charles, Slowe, Esq., Linda Marie, against Nantucket Lightship Basket Museum, Inc., represented by Amara, Esq., Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Paul D. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul D. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Elizabeth A. McIsaac against the Nantucket Lightship Basket Museum, Inc. The plaintiff attended a yard sale held by the defendant on November 18, 2017, at Bartlett's Farm in Nantucket, Massachusetts. During the yard sale, t...
Affidavit of Robert J. Amara, Esq.
Date: November 15, 2021Plaintiff Elizabeth A McIsaac's Request for 90-Day Nisi Order
Date: May 03, 2022Affidavit of Robert J. Amara, Esq. Applies To: McIsaac, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)
Date: February 04, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 13, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: November 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice on all counts and without costs. Applies To: McIsaac, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff); Nantucket Lightship Basket Museum, Inc. (Defendant) | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 08/02/2022 Judge: Wilson, Hon. Paul D | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/06/2022 12:30 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Reported Settled Comments: 90 day Nisi Order issued Hon. Paul D Wilson, Presiding
Judge: Wilson, Paul D |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Elizabeth A McIsaac's Request for 90-Day Nisi Order | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 5/6/2022 at 12:30 PM - IN PERSON | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Linda Marie Slowe, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Elizabeth A McIsaac | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date James C Crowley, Jr., Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Elizabeth A McIsaac | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#12.0) to allow Robert J Amara, Esq.to inspect hospital records regarding Elizabeth A McIsaac, from Cape Cod Hospital . | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Robert J. Amara, Esq. | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Nantucket Lightship Basket Museum, Inc. for hospital records from Cape Cod Hospital, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. With Proposed Order Applies To: McIsaac, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.