Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Borden, Katherine Flanders, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Adams, Esq., Scott, against Glidden, Richard J, Sherry, William J, represented by Buchholz, Esq., Robert, Delinks, Esq., Marissa I, Schultz, Esq., Hilary S, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Mark Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark Gildea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice to Clerk of the Appeals Court of Assembly of Record
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of assembly of record sent to Counsel
Date: February 26, 2021Appeal: Statement of the Case on Appeal (Cover Sheet).
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Clerk of the Appeals Court of Assembly of Record | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of assembly of record sent to Counsel | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Appeal: Statement of the Case on Appeal (Cover Sheet). | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CD of Transcript of 08/20/2020 12:00 PM Motion Hearing received from PBH Paralegal & Transcription Services, Inc.. Requested by defendant. | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal: Party's Letter received re: no transcript on appeal Applies To: Adams, Esq., Scott (Attorney) on behalf of Katherine Flanders Borden Personal Representative for the Estate of Leroy Flanders (Plaintiff) | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Katherine Flanders Borden, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leroy Flanders Appeals from Judgments of Dismissal (Docket ## 12, 13) of the claims against Defendants Richard J. Glidden and William J. Sherry entered on November 17, 2020. Applies To: Katherine Flanders Borden Personal Representative for the Estate of Leroy Flanders (Plaintiff) | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Scott Adams, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Katherine Flanders Borden Personal Representative for the Estate of Leroy Flanders | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se dismissed/withdrawn as Self Represented for Plaintiff Katherine Flanders Borden Personal Representative for the Estate of Leroy Flanders | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Pleading titled, Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal and Motion for Injunctive Relief for Court Hearing to Determine Validity of the TOD Document That This Case Revolves Around That Has Stolen My Father's Estate Money and Request for Stay of this Case Until Federal Court Case Appeal Outcome, filed with the court on 12/11/2020, returned to Pro Se Katherine Flanders Borden Personal Representative for the Estate of Leroy Flanders Superior Court Rule 9D Motions for Reconsideration shall be served and processed consistent with Superior Court Rule 9A | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for (Emergency Motion) Injunctive Relief to Determine Validity of the TOD Document That This Case Revolves Around and Request for Merrill Lynch To Pay My Attorney Fees as They Have Left Me Financially Destitute From This Improperly Filed Case Revolving Around An Invalid Document (#14.0): DENIED The motion is denied, the defendants' motion to dismiss having previously been allowed. Further, the motion makes reference to "this Interpleader case" when this action was commenced by the plaintiff. This court does not have the ability to appoint an attorney for the Plaintiff in a civil action such as this. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.