Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nantucket Islands Land Bank, Ngm, Inc., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Galvin, Esq., Lauren Janice Clifford, Hurley, Esq., Brian Michael, Swett, Esq., Valerie, against Granite State Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 11/13/2019
Date: November 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to the United States District Court filed by Defendant. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with Notice of Removal USDC District of Massachusetts CA No: 1:20-CV-10344 Applies To: Granite State Insurance Company member of AIG, Inc. (Defendant) | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE returned for Defendant Granite State Insurance Company member of AIG, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;Rick McJeeters, Legal Department | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE returned for Defendant Granite State Insurance Company member of AIG, Inc.: Service c/o Commonwealth of Massachusetts Corporations Division 84 State Street Boston, MA | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 11/13/2019 | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Brian Michael Hurley, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Nantucket Islands Land Bank | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Valerie Swett, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Nantucket Islands Land Bank | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Lauren Janice Clifford Galvin, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Nantucket Islands Land Bank | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Brian Michael Hurley, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff NGM, Inc. | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Valerie Swett, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff NGM, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.