Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hingham Institute For Savings, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lane, Esq., Robert Andrew, against Goldweitz, David A, Goldweitz, Joyce B, Goldweitz, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Robert C. Rufo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Rufo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Plaintiff Hingham Institute for Savings's Motion for Order of Default (with Proposed Order)
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. Judge: Rufo, Hon. Robert C Applies To: Goldweitz, David A (Defendant); Goldweitz, Mark R (Defendant); Goldweitz, Joyce B (Defendant) Attested Copies Mailed 1/3/2020 RAL
Judge: Rufo, Robert C |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default: 55(a) re: Foreclosure Judge: Adams, Mary Elizabeth Applies To: Goldweitz, David A (Defendant); Goldweitz, Mark R (Defendant); Goldweitz, Joyce B (Defendant) Attested Copy Mailed 1/3/2020 RAL
Judge: Mary Elizabeth Applies To: Goldweitz, David A (Defendant); Goldweitz, Mark R (Defendant); Goldweitz, Joyce B (Defendant) Attested Copy Mailed 1/3/2020 RALAdams Mary Elizabeth Applies To: Goldweitz David A (Defendant); Goldweitz Mark R (Defendant); Goldweitz |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Take the Complaint for Confessed (#7.0): ALLOWED Judge: Rufo, Hon. Robert C
Judge: Robert C Rufo |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Goldweitz, Joyce B: Defaulted - Foreclosure; | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Goldweitz, Mark R: Defaulted - Foreclosure; | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Goldweitz, David A: Defaulted - Foreclosure; | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hingham Institute for Savings's Motion for Order of Default (with Proposed Order) | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant David A Goldweitz, Mark R Goldweitz, Joyce B Goldweitz are not in the Military | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Notice by Publication, returned SERVED Copy of Order of Notice published in the Inquirer & Mirror, Nantucket Registry of Deeds Recorded 12/06/2019; SERVICE of Order of Notice and LAR Information Sheet by Last & Usual to David A. Goldweitz, Mark R. Goldweitz (two addresses), Joyce B. Goldweitz on 11/16/19 Applies To: Goldweitz, David A (Defendant); Goldweitz, Mark R (Defendant); Goldweitz, Joyce B (Defendant) | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hingham Institute for Savings's Motion for Order Authorizing Foreclosure of Mortgage (with Proposed Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.