Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sd White Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Administrative Civil Actions case represented by Hannington, Esq., Glen, against Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission, represented by Pucci, Esq., George X, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to SD White Properties, LLC's original complaint | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date George X Pucci, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE Returned for Defendant Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission: Service through person in charge / agent; Jeff Carlson, Administrator | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 06/26/2019 mailed 6/26/19 gh | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Glen Hannington, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff SD White Properties, LLC | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.