Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jibo & Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brodie, Esq., Warren H, against Duddy, Erica D, Duddy, Ryan A, represented by Griffin, Esq., Stephen P, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Susan E. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan E. Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Jibo & Company, Inc.'s Memorandum Post-Trial Memorandum | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Ryan A Duddy, Erica D Duddy's Memorandum Post Trial Memorandum | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | List of exhibits | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion in limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence as to Labor Costs due to Plaintiff's Destruction of Key Evidence (#17.0): DENIED After hearing, denied. It is not clear that the documents existed when the dispute arose. The defendants' concerns go to the weight of the evidence, not to admissibility. Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion in limine to Limit the Scope of Plaintiff's Expert's Testimony (#16.0): DENIED as moot. The expert is not testifying at trial. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Jury Waived Trial scheduled on: 05/12/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Warren H Brodie, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Stephen P Griffin, Esq., Private Counsel In lieu of oral closing parties will file Post Trial Memo with spreadsheet by 6/2/21
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion in limine to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness and Statement of Reasons in Support (#21.0): DENIED After hearing denied, as there is no prejudice and plaintiff will himself testify as an expert, without formal Rule 30B disclosure. Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Waived Trial scheduled on: 05/11/2021 12:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Warren H Brodie, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Stephen P Griffin, Esq., Private Counsel
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/10/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Deft in person, Pltf via videoconferencing Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Warren H Brodie, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Stephen P Griffin, Esq., Private Counsel
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jibo & Company, Inc. files proposed Rulings of Law Applies To: Brodie, Esq., Warren H (Attorney) on behalf of Jibo & Company, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.