Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Woodmeister Master Builders, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gibbons, Esq., Robert B, against Galvin, Elizabeth, Galvin, Michael, Sheridan, Sr., Philip H, represented by Landers, Jr., Esq., Edwin F, Storm, Esq., Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts with Robert C. Cosgrove presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Cosgrove Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2019 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Woodmeister Master Builders, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal All claims, counterclaims and other claims asserted herein, are dismissed with prejudice, without costs and with each party bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs. All parties waive their right to appeal. Applies To: Woodmeister Master Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); Galvin, Michael (Defendant); Galvin, Elizabeth (Defendant); Philip H Sheridan, Sr. Trustee of The Tekcutnan Nominee Trust (Defendant) | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/21/2021 12:30 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Robert C Cosgrove, Presiding
Judge: Cosgrove, Robert C |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request to Extend Nisi to September 17, 2021 (#10.0): ALLOWED Judge: Cosgrove, Hon. Robert C | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Woodmeister Master Builders, Inc.'s Joint Request to Extend Nisi Order to September 17, 2021 | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 08/19/2021 Judge: Cosgrove, Hon. Robert C | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/27/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Robert C Cosgrove, Presiding
Judge: Cosgrove, Robert C |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Woodmeister Master Builders, Inc.'s Joint Request for entry of a 30-Day Nisi Order | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/20/2021 10:15 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Reported Settled Comments: Request for 30-Day Nisi Mary Elizabeth Adams, Clerk of Courts | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Final Trial Conference on 7/20/2021 at 10:15 AM Emailed/Mailed 6/18/2021 Notice Sent To: Robert B Gibbons, Esq. Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie and Lougee 100 Front St, Worcester, MA 01608-1477 Notice Sent To: Christopher Storm, Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210 Notice Sent To: Edwin F Landers, Jr., Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Jury Trial 09/27/2021 at 9:00 AM Emailed/Mailed 3/25/2021 RBG/CS/EFL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.