Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nixon Peabody Llp, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Roos, Esq., Sigmund J, against Bedminster Marlboro, Inc., Cachalot Land Company, Llc, Certain Real Estate Located Within The Commonwealth, Forty-One Pleasant Street, Llc, Gifford, Iii, Charles H., (total of 7) See All represented by Lawson, Jr., Esq., Edward G, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Edward G. Lawson, Jr., Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Charles H. Gifford, III | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | After notice and hearing, it is hereby ordered that on Count I of the Complaint, JUDGMENT shall enter in favor of plaintiff against the reach and apply defendants...(see file for full text)...So ordered this 4th day of December 2014. | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for asessment of damages (#15.0): Motion for Judgment on Reach and Apply Defendants ALLOWED | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2014 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Appeared: Sigmund J. Roos, Esquire | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Notice of Hearing Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2) | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Nixon Peabody LLP's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(2) and Assessment of Damages Applies To: Gifford, III, Charles H. (Defendant); Bedminster Marlboro, Inc. (Reach & Apply Defendant); South Coast Recycling, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Waste Options Nantucket, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Forty-One Pleasant Street, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Cachalot Land Company, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant) | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Gifford, III, Charles H.: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Nixon Peabody LLP's request for Default 55(a) (oral) Applies To: Gifford, III, Charles H. (Defendant); Bedminster Marlboro, Inc. (Reach & Apply Defendant); South Coast Recycling, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Waste Options Nantucket, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Forty-One Pleasant Street, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant); Cachalot Land Company, LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant) | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Gifford, III, Charles H.: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Reach & Apply Defendants Bedminster Marlboro, Inc, South Coast Recycling, LLC; Waste Options Nantucket, LLC; Forty-One Pleasant Street, LLC; Cachalot Land Company, LLC.: Defaulted by 55(a) request; Applies To: Bedminster Marlboro, Inc. (Defendant) South Coast Recycling, LLC (Defendant); Waste Options Nantucket, LLC (Defendant); Forty-One Pleasant Street, LLC (Defendant); Cachalot Land Company, LLC (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.