We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Case Details

Filing Date

May 13, 2009

Last Refreshed

April 10, 2021

Filing Location

Nantucket County, MA

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Motion (P#77) After hearing, DENIED. Genuine issues of material fact remain. (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice) Notices faxed 1/23/2012 JRD, SF, RD
Docket Event Motion (P#76) After hearing, DENIED. Plaintiffs 59H motion was filed beyond the 60 day period. Defendant Laudano s counterclaim hinges on whether Plaintiffs sued Laudano without basis and for the ulterior motive of pressuring Laudano to testify against Matthews. This court is ill equipped to resolve the factual issues on the affidavits alone. A jury trial is warranted. (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice) Notices faxed 1/23/12 JRD, SF, RD
Docket Event Nantucket Bank Check 285028 in the amount of $10,009.50 returned to Steven D Frank/ Nicholas J. Laudano et al, (escrow held in 09-34)
Docket Event Court received assented to request for return of $10,000.00 escrow funds to Deft's counsel.
Docket Event Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to all parties and as to all claims and counter claims in this civil action, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the MRCP. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, all rights of appeal are waived.
Docket Event ORDER ON DEFENDANTS NICHOLAS J. LAUDANO, NJL BUILDING, INC., F/N/A NJL BUILDING CONSULTANTS, LLC AND NJL DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.'S CROSS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS: At the hearing on the above-cited motion on January 20, 2012, the parties agreed that the following counts on Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint shall be dismissed: Counts 3, 8, 10 through 20. After hearing the arguments of the parties and considering their briefs and cases submitted the court ORDERS that Count 7, alleging violation of the Racketeer Influenced Corrupt Organizations Act is DISMISSED. Taking the plaintiffs' allegations as true, Laudano's conduct is not the type of activity RICO intended to target, nor is it the kind of activity where courts have been inclined to find closed-ended continuity. DATED: February 14, 2012. (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice of the Superior Court). Copies faxed and mailed 2/15/12 JD, RD, SF
Docket Event Motion (P#91) DENIED as Emergency Motion. Counsel may proceed pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice) Notices faxed 2/13/2012 RD, JD, SF
Docket Event P #91 faxed to RAJ
Docket Event Emergency MOTION to Withdraw Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by Richard M. Dohoney, Esquire with Proposed Withdrawal of Appearance
Docket Event Pleading returned to James R. Davis, Esq., at his request, sent in error
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.