Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Beede, Mitchell, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kyburg, Esq., Peter D, against Dougan, Dwayne M., Dougan, Liliana, One Mayflower Circle Cooperative, Inc., represented by Mclaughlin, Esq., James F, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2009 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed Pursuant to Superior Court Rule 14 | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Removal of Exhibits notices mailed 8/4/2014 PK/JFM | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibits List | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Court received Certified Copy of Order "United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Massachusetts in re: Lilianna Dougan and Dwayne M. Dougan Debtors Chapter 7 Case No. 11-19503: ORDER AVOIDING JUDICIAL LIEN: The Debtors' Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien pursuant to 11 U.S.C. sec 522(f)(1)(A) and MLBR 4003-1(a) to avoid the certain judicial lien Execution of Mitchell Beede against the real estate at One Mayflower Circle, Nantucket, MA 02554, is sustained, and the Court HEREBY FINDS AND ORDERS: The judicial lien Writ of Attachment of Mitchell Beede recorded with the Nantucket County Registry of Deeds on May 19, 2009 as document 00127193, certificate 22959, and, The judicial lien Execution of Mitchell Beede recorded with the Nantucket County Registry of Deeds on Novermber 3, 2011 as document 00135040, certificate 22959, impair an exemption to which the Debtors are otherwise entitled by Law and pursuant to the finding of the Court, WHEREBY the above-referenced liens of said judicial lien creditor Metchell Beede shall not survive bankruptcy nor affix to nor remain enforcebable against the aforementioned property of the Debtors, and the liens stand avoided. SO ORDERED SUBJECT TO 11 U.S.C. sec349. William C. Hillman 01/08/2013 U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff v Dwayne M. Dougan, Liliana Dougan, One Mayflower Circle Cooperative in amount of $101,683.33, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff's Attorney Peter Kyburg | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for execution | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#29) DENIED, as the jury's verdict was well within the scope of the admitted evidence and the reasonable inferences therefrom. (John C. Cratsley, Justice) Notices mailed 5/31/2011 PK, JMcL | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#31) DENIED as I feel as the trial judge that the jury's verdict was not excessive but within the range of the admitted evidence and the reasonable inferences therefrom. (John C. Cratsley, Justice) Notices mailed 5/31/2011 PK, JMcL | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing held on (P#29) Defendants' Motion for Judgment NOV, or in the Alternative, For a New Trial, and (P#31) Defendants' Motion for Remittitur. Matters taken under advisement. (John C. Cratsley, Justice) | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice faxed to appear (or be available for telephone conference) on 5/19/2011 at 2:30pm for a hearing on Motion for JNOV and Motion for Remittitur (Notice faxed JM, PK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.