Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tasch, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ravech, Esq., Paul E, against Glynn E. Franklin, Sr., represented by Tierney, Esq., Philip T, Callahan, Esq., John Richard, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2009 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs. All rigths of appeal waived. | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 11/22/2010 (Carhart, Justice) mailed 09/23 PR JC PT | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Pltff's notice of settlement by way of binding hi-low arbitration, request for 60 day order (by fax 9/17, orig 9/20). | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Pre-trial ORDER on 5/13/2010; parties notified | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 5/3/2010 | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER and Jury Claim of Glynn E. Franklin, Sr.(Defendant) | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Glynn E. Franklin, Sr.(Defendant) | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | One Trial case upon review of judge, case to remain in Superior Court. 2/18/09 (Nickerson, J by telephone) | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint, civil action cover sheet and docket sheet forwarded to Judge Nickerson for One Trial Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.