Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Currier, Faith M., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen, Hon. Jennifer M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryProbate Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Motion To Incorporate Conciliator's Decision into Decree WOF | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Status Conference scheduled on: 04/12/2023 08:30 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Status Conference scheduled on: 09/09/2022 08:30 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference - Probate and Guardianship Date: 06/02/2022 Time: 08:30 AM Result: No Action Taken: No Judgmen/Decree/Order Issued
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule Status Conference ALLOWED on 01/20/2022 File Reference # 11 | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Assented-to Motion To Continue/Reschedule Status Conference | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection of Linda S Stucchi to Petition to Terminate | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Response of Special Representative to Petition to Terminate Trust | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order 10/26/2021, Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.