Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tocci, Iii, Paul L, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBisenius, Hon. Theresa A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: June 16, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: June 16, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 01/20/2022 13:21:24 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Re-Issued, previous letters were never received by the Attorney. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 10/15/2021 10:11:52 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 09/24/2021 13:34:00 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 09/24/2021 13:32:15 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate dated 9/22/2021 Approved By: Lisa Casey | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/22/2021, by Unassigned Lisa Casey | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Expedited Hearing ALLOWED on 06/18/2021 File Reference # 27 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Town Crier-Sudbury. | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Special Pers. Rep. Sent On: 07/01/2021 09:52:04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.