Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sturgill, Brenda A., filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Duffy, Esq., Christopher Paul, against Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, represented by Mohan, Esq., Catherine A, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/07/2022
Date: September 07, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 07, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation: Service through person in charge / agent; In hand to MJ Hall on, 9/15/2022 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED In hand to Ross Depina on, 9/15/2022 Applies To: General Electric Company (Defendant) | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant General Electric Company: Acknowledgement of Service | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Catherine A Mohan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant General Electric Company | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/07/2022 | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.