Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dunnigan, Jessica, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carroll, Esq., Jeremy Michael, Foster, Esq., Robert, against Gymja Warrior, Inc., represented by Johnson, Esq., Michael Patrick, Killeen, Esq., Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher K Copied presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K Copied Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 03/16/2021
Date: March 16, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Amend Tracking Order Deadlines (#8.0): ALLOWED Deadlines at paragraph 14 a & b are adopted and clerk will schedule final pretrial conference for on or after Jan. 2023.(Dated: 7/18/22) notice sent 7/19/22 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/26/2022 02:15 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Staff: Dia S Roberts-Tyler, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Copied from linked case: 2181CV00588
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 07/19/2022 10:19:26 Copied from linked case: 2181CV00588 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/19/2022 10:17:11 Copied from linked case: 2181CV00588 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/19/2022 10:12:16 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 07/19/2022 10:14:11 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/26/2022 02:15 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Staff: Dia S Roberts-Tyler, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Brendan G Carney, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Jessica Dunnigan | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Copied from linked case: 2181CV00588 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.