Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shinewald, Samantha, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Davis, Esq., Maria, Wish, Esq., Benjamin J, against Camp Specialists Llc, represented by Bloom, Brian A., Noel, Esq., Thomas R, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Hélène Kazanjian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHélène Kazanjian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Plaintiff Samantha Shinewald's Motion for Preliminary Injunction.
Date: September 07, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/08/2021
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction (#14.1): DENIED Denied as moot in light of parties stipulation of dismissal of case. (Dated: 2/11/22) notice sent 2/14/22 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Defendant to Strike Filing and For An Award of Attorneys' Fees (#18.2): No Action Taken No action taken on motion as case has settled and dismissal filed. (Dated: 2/11/22) notice sent 2/14/22 | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Camp Specialists, LLC To Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint (#15.0): Other action taken While this motion was under advisement, on 1/28 parties stipulated to dismissal of entire case, so no action on motion will be taken. (Dated: 2/11/22) notice sent 12/14/22 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Massachusetts Superior Court Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties, SAMANTHA SHINEWALD and CAMP SPECIALISTS, LLC, hereby stipulate and agree that this action, including all claims and counterclaims be dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Applies To: Shinewald, Samantha (Plaintiff); Camp Specialists Llc (Defendant) | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 02/14/2022 received an email from Attorney Benjamin Wish reporting the case settled and requesting a 30 day order Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 01/06/2022 02:30 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Strike Filing and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Applies To: Camp Specialists Llc (Defendant) | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Camp Specialists Llc's Memorandum in support of Motion to strike Filing and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Camp Specialists Llc's EMERGENCY Motion to strike Filing and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion to strike Filing and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Applies To: Shinewald, Samantha (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.