Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Manual Cela Guaman, As Father And Next Friend Of Jorge Vinicio Cela Caguana, Vinicio Cela Caguana, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by O'Neill, Esq., Owen Roe, Palazzolo, Jr., Esq., Ernest J, against Harvest Realty Ventures, Llc, R & J Construction Inc., represented by Chapdelaine, Esq., Marc E, Fallman, Esq., Edward J, Ryan, Esq., Timothy Robert, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Sarah W. Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah W. Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/07/2021
Date: September 07, 2021Received from Defendant R & J Construction Inc.: Answer to the Crossclaim; and jury demand
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Tracking Order Deadlines (#14.0): ALLOWED Discovery extended to 6-22-23. Rule 56 filing deadline to 8-24-23 and FPTC scheduled 12-5-23 at 2 pm via ZOOM ID 161 369 5987. (Dated: 3/24/23) notice sent 3/24/23 Judge: Ellis, Hon. Sarah Weyland | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Manual Cela Guaman, as Father and Next Friend of Jorge Vinicio Cela Caguana(is Minor), R & J Construction Inc.'s Joint Motion to extend tracking order deadlines. | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: Applies To: O'Neill, Esq., Owen Roe (Attorney) on behalf of Manual Cela Guaman, as Father and Next Friend of Jorge Vinicio Cela Caguana(is Minor) (Plaintiff); Ryan, Esq., Timothy Robert (Attorney) on behalf of R & J Construction Inc. (Defendant) | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Timothy Robert Ryan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant R & J Construction Inc. | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 03/20/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled For the following reason: Event Changed Comments: Motion to Extend Tracking Order Deadlines coming in Hon. Sarah Weyland Ellis, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ellis, Sarah Weyland |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference, via zoom ID: 160 506 3147, passcode: 496486 Sent On: 01/11/2023 14:54:11 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue October 17, 2022 Final Pre-Trial Conference and extend Discovery deadline 120 days. (#12.0): ALLOWED Discovery extended to 2-17-23, Final Pre-Trial Conference continued to 3/20/23 at 2PM. Dated: Oct.17, 2022 and notices mailed 10/18/22 Judge: Frison, Hon. Shannon
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 10/17/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Shannon Frison, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jorge Vinicio Cela Caguana By his/her Father and/or Next Friend Manuel Cela Guaman, R & J Construction Inc.'s Joint Motion to continue October 17, 2022 final pre-trial conference and extend discovery deadline 120 days. | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 09/02/2022 12:30:53 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.