Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
G. Blais Construction Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Corner, Esq., Mark Westbrook, against Clairmont Realty Llc, represented by Mirageas, Esq., Peter M, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Deakin, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeakin, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/03/2021
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRECTED JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith Judgment For: Clairmont Realty Llc -Counterclaim Plaintiff Judgment Against: G. Blais Construction Llc - Counterclaim Defendant Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 09/03/2021 Jdgmnt Date: 08/30/2023 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 36539.00 Other Costs: 247.60 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 27360.00 Judgment Total: 72,874.09 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith Judgment For: G. Blais Construction Llc Judgment Against: Clairmont Realty Llc Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 09/03/2021 Jdgmnt Date: 08/24/2023 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 36539.00 Other Costs: 247.60 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 27360.00 Judgment Total: 72,801.96 | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Default Judgment under Rule 55(B)(2) (#8.0): ALLOWED Dated 8/21/23 Following hearing this day and based on the affidavit of Mr. Orfaly and the attorney's fees affidavit of Atty. Mirageas, the motion is allowed and Default Judgment will enter in the amount of $36,539 plus Atty. fees of $27,360 and costs of $247.60 So Ordered. | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 08/21/2023 02:15 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Clairmont Realty Llc's Notice for Assessment of Damages | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Peter M. Mirageas regarding Attorney's Fees | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant, Plaintiff in a Counterclaim Clairmont Realty Llc's Request for Default Judgment Under Rule 55(B)(2) | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant, Plaintiff in a Counterclaim Clairmont Realty Llc's Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Robert Orfaly | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Plaintiff, Defendant in a Counterclaim G. Blais Construction Llc is not in the Military |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.