Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nguon, Matt, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Pro Se, against Seta, Phay, represented by Peace, Esq., Roger Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Camille F. Sarrouf, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCamille F. Sarrouf, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Complaint The Motion is Denied after hearing and review. The Court has no authority to grant the requested trespass. Judge: Sarrouf, Camille | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: That the relief sought in the complaint being denied, the action is dismissed without prejudice. Judge: Sarrouf, Camille | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/10/2021 03:15 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Camille Sarrouf, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Matt Nguon Defendant Phay Seta Roger Alexander Peace, Esq., Staff: Matthew Day, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed.On this date Roger Alexander Peace, Esq. added for Defendant Phay Seta | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/09/2021 14:20:33 Notice Sent To: Matt Nguon 291 Foster Street, Lowell, MA 01851 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/10/2021 11:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Camille Sarrouf, Presiding Staff: Matthew Day, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/07/2021 09:40:31 Notice Sent To: Matt Nguon 291 Foster Street, Lowell, MA 01851 Notice Sent To: Phay Seta 285 Foster Street, Lowell, MA 01851 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 09/10/2021 11:00 AM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Applies To: Seta, Phay (Defendant) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.