Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maple Ridge Estates Homeowner'S Association Trust, By Its Trustees, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Flynn, Esq., Frank Anthony, Gamelin, Esq., Patrick R, against Scondras, Andrea, Scondras, Norris A., in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Sarah W. Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah W. Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 18, 2021Affidavit of Trustee in Regard to Documents
Date: May 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Issuance of Execution (#12.0): No Action Taken No action taken pending Plaintiff's further submission and the Court's entry of final judgment. See Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Assessment of Damages, paragraph 8. | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Certified copy of Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Assessment of Damages mailed to plaintiff's counsel of record, Patrick Gamelin, this day, 6/27/2023. Assistant Clerk Emily Jackson | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Maple Ridge Estates Homeowner's Association Trust, By Its Trustees's Request for Issuance of Execution | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES (see scanned image, 3 pages) | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Trustee in Regard to Documents | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Revised Affidavit of Trustee in Regard to Calculation of Damages | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Counsel, Frank A. Flynn, Esq., in Regard to Calculation of Attorney's Fees and Costs | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 05/18/2023 02:15 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Sarah Weyland Ellis, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Patrick R Gamelin, Esq., Staff: Emily Jackson, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ellis, Sarah Weyland |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Patrick R Gamelin, Esq. added for Plaintiff Maple Ridge Estates Homeowner's Association Trust, By Its Trustees | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Filings/Orders Proposed Findings and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.