Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Depiano, Anthony, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Halstrom, Esq., Ingrid Alexandra, Pro Se, against Russakovsky, O.D., Alex, Saini O.D., Nikhil, Wilmington Eye Group, Inc., represented by Flanagan, Esq., William Joseph, Holmes, Esq., Matthew Joseph, O'Brien, Esq., Jessica, Racette, Esq., Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher K 20 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K 20 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 17, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: That in accordance with the endorsement of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and said motion having been ALLOWED without opposition and for the reasons stated in the motion, the Plaintiff's complaint be and hereby is DISMISSED. Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss of Defendants (#23.0): ALLOWED Without opposition and for the reasons stated in the motion, motion to dismiss is allowed. So ordered. (Dated: 10/17/22) notice sent 10/18/22 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Paper #23, Motion to dismiss referred to Judge Barry-Smith for review and consideration. | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Alex Russakovsky, O.D., Wilmington Eye Group, Inc.'s Notice of filing. | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with superior court rule 9A | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Alex Russakovsky, O.D., Wilmington Eye Group, Inc.'s Motion to dismiss | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice to Board of Registration in Medicine of Tribunal Finding. Judge: Tabit, Hon. Salim
Judge: Tabit, Salim |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The medical malpractice tribunal made up of Hon. Salim Tabit, Ernest A. Sutcliff, M.D. and Jonas A Jacobson, Esq., having met on 07/20/2022 09:00 AM Malpractice Tribunal reports that there are not sufficient evidence to raise a legitimate question as to liability appropriate for judicial inquiry. Judge: Tabit, Hon. Salim Applies To: Depiano, Anthony (Plaintiff); Russakovsky, O.D., Alex (Defendant); Wilmington Eye Group, Inc. (Defendant) | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Malpractice Tribunal scheduled on: 07/20/2022 09:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Salim Tabit, Presiding Staff: Debra J Newman, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Tabit, Salim |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Malpractice Tribunal scheduled on: 07/20/2022 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Transferred to another session Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Staff: Arthur T DeGuglielmo, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.