Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Endpoint, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Collimore, Esq., Kevin G, Shirley, Esq., Jonathan M, against The Woods, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Douglas H. Wilkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H. Wilkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Proposed Filings/Orders
Date: February 02, 2021Plaintiff(s) Endpoint, Llc's Motion to Supplement the Record.
Date: February 16, 2021Endorsement on Motion for special process (#6.0): ALLOWED
Date: February 03, 2021Plaintiff Endpoint, Llc's EX PARTE Motion for Real Estate Attachment
Date: February 02, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: February 02, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: February 02, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 02/02/2021
Date: February 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties to the above-entitled action, pursuant to the provisions of Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii) hereby stipulate that said action by Plaintiff Endpoint, LLC be dismissed as to the Defendant The Woods, LLC, expenses to be borne by party which incurred them, and all rights of appeal waived. Applies To: Endpoint, Llc (Plaintiff); The Woods, Llc (Defendant) | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 06/15/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/11/2022 10:37:36 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 02/16/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment (#3.0): ALLOWED After hearing with testimony and notice to the defendant, the motion is ALLOWED. There is a reasonable likelihood of recovery greater than or equal to $75,000.00. Notices mailed 2/16/21. Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Endpoint, Llc's Motion to Supplement the Record. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant The Woods, Llc: Service made at last and usual; 2/11/21 at 199 Salem Street, Wakefield, MA 01880. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 02/09/2021 10:30 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: No Proper Notice to Parties Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Real Estate Attachment (#3.0): Other action taken The within matter is set down for hearing on 2-16-21 via zoom ID 160 192 3402. Passcode 871 120 at 9:00am. | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for special process (#6.0): ALLOWED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.