Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Em Holdco Llc, Gscp Vi Edgemarc Holdings, L.L.C., Gscp Vi Parallel Edgemarc Holdings, L.L.C., Wsep And Bridge 2012 Edgemarc Holdings, L.L.C., filed a(n) Miscellaneous Civil Actions case in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Patrick M. Haggan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick M. Haggan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: January 18, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: January 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: That all relief sought having been granted, the action is DISMISSED without prejudice. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER: ON APPLICATION FOR DISCOVERY ORDER: After consideration of the Application for Discovery Order submitted by the applicants, GSCP VI EdgeMarc Holdings, LLC, GSCP VI Parallel EdgeMarc Holdings, LLC, WSEP and Bridge 2012 EdgeMarc Holdings, LLC and EM Holdco LLC (collectively, the "Applicants"), and pursuant to M.G.L. ch. 223A, sec 11 it is hereby: ORDERED: 1. That the Applicants' Application for Discovery is GRANTED; and 2. Counsel for the Applicants is hereby authorized by this Court to issue and serve the Subpoena Duces Tecum identified in and attached to the Application for Discovery Order as Exhibit 2, pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 45, for service on GeoEngineers, Inc., and to obtain the discovery requested therein. Dated: January 21, 2021. Certified copy mailed 1/22/2021. Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Application for Discovery Order (#1.0): ALLOWED After review, application is ALLOWED. Dated: January 21, 2021. Notice mailed 1/22/21. Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: PROPOSED | |
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 01/18/2021 | |
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.