Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Berkshire Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Veerman, Esq., Daniel J, against Garmax Taxi, Inc., Louis, Maxo, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Jackie A. Cowin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie A. Cowin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Berkshire Bank's Motion to assess damages and to enter final judgment.
Date: March 30, 2021Entered as to: Defendant Garmax Taxi, Inc.: Defaulted by 55(a) request
Date: March 18, 2021Plaintiff(s) Berkshire Bank's Motion for Short Order of Notice
Date: November 12, 2020Plaintiff(s) Berkshire Bank's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction
Date: November 12, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: November 12, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Garmax Taxi, Inc. / Louis, Maxo Judgment Creditor: Berkshire Bank Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 12/28/2021 Judgment Total: 393,053.42 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 27,931.95 Execution Subtotal: 420,985.37 Execution Total: 420,985.37 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith Judgment For: Berkshire Bank Judgment Against: Garmax Taxi, Inc. Maxo Louis Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/20/2021 Jdgmnt Date: 05/26/2021 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 387791.92 Other Costs: 543.00 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 3953.00 Judgment Total: 393,053.42 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION (which see 2pgs). Dated at Woburn, Ma this 26th day of May | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages and to Enter Final Judgment (#12.0): ALLOWED After hearing, at which Mr. Louis appeared, the motion is Allowed and judgment shall enter consistent with the moving papers and affidavits, in the amount of $387,791.92 together with attorneys' fees of $3,953.00. So ordered. (Dated: 5/19/21) notice sent 5/21/21 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 05/19/2021 02:45 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Staff: Dia S Roberts-Tyler, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of of Marven Joseph in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Assessment of Damages against Defendants | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/06/2021 08:54:00 Notice Sent To: Daniel J Veerman, Esq. Cohn and Dussi, LLC 68 Harrison Ave Suite 502, Boston, MA 02111 Notice Sent To: Garmax Taxi, Inc. 133 Pearl Street Apt 2, Somerville, MA 02143 Notice Sent To: Maxo Louis 133 Pearl Street Apt 2, Somerville, MA 02143 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Berkshire Bank's Motion to assess damages and to enter final judgment. | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Garmax Taxi, Inc.: Defaulted by 55(a) request | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Berkshire Bank's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Garmax Taxi, Inc. (Defendant); Louis, Maxo (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.