Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hancock Somerville Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Davulis, Esq., Andrea Lynn, Suny, Esq., David R, against 74 Ltd, D B A Snappy Sushi, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Patrick M. Haggan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick M. Haggan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's Motion for alternate service of process
Date: January 15, 2021Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's Certificate of Compliance with Rule 4.2(g)
Date: December 17, 2020Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's EX PARTE Motion for Trustee Process Attachment
Date: December 17, 2020Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's EX PARTE Motion to Successive Service
Date: December 17, 2020Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's Motion to Appoint Special Process Server
Date: December 17, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 17, 2020Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's Notice of Dismissal No comes the Plaintiff and, pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41, files this Notice of Dismissal of the above-referenced action against all defendants. No attorney has ever filed an appearance on behalf of 74 LTD d/b/a Snappy Sushi. | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Trustee Defendant Santander Bank, NA: Answer to original complaint (no effects); | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Trustee Process scheduled on: 01/19/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER: FINDING AND ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF ATTACHMENT ON TRUSTEE: The Court hereby finds that as the Plaintiff has recovered a judgment and execution and that there is no liability insurance that would be available to satisfy the judgment. Therefore, the Court hereby approves attachment on any account maintained by the Defendant 74 LTD, d/b/a Snappy Sushi at the Trustee Defendant Santander Bank, N.A., including but not limited to Account Nos. Xxxxxx5960, xxxxxx0466, xxxxxx6169, xxxxxx5952, and xxxxxx1138 in the amount of $138,279.07. Subject to all applicable exemptions and limitations permitted by law. Certified copy mailed 1/19/21. Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Trustee Process (#5.0): ALLOWED After hearing with defendants present via zoom and participating, the motion is ALLOWED. Notices mailed 1/19/21. Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Andrea Lynn Davulis, Esq. added for Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Alternate Service of Process (#7.0): ALLOWED 1/15/21 After review (including attachments), the Motion for Alternative Service or Process is ALLOWED. Valid service may be effectuated by properly serving Kazuhiro Aotani, the registered agent and only listed officer of the defendant corporation. Although service of Mr. Aotani was attempted by the plaintiff as described in the motion and attachments, it has not yet been successful. Based upon the court's prior ruling on the plaintiff's ex parte motion for trustee process (Cowin, J., hearing ordered with notice to the defendant, Paper #5, 12/28/20 endorsement), the January 19, 2021 scheduled hearing on that motion will be cancelled (unless service/notice is made by January 18, 2021). The plaintiff should request to reschedule the hearing on trustee process upon notice to the defendant pursuant to this order. So ordered. (Haggan, J.) emailed 1-15-2021 Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hancock Somerville Llc's Motion for alternate service of process | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Trustee Process scheduled on: 01/04/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Haggan, Patrick |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Trustee Process scheduled on: 12/28/2020 10:30 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: and rescheduled Hon. Jackie Cowin, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.