Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Porrier, Jane, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Madden, Esq., Rachel J, Saunders, Esq., Rachel, Tetzel, Esq., Paul L, against The Dolben Company, Inc., Wells Landscaping, Inc., Woodview Apartments, Llc, represented by Murray, Esq., Bruce H, Nunez, Esq., Asbel, Thebaud, Esq., Darlene, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Haggan, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaggan, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 03/18/2024 Time: 09:00 AM | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/05/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Sarah Weyland Ellis, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ellis, Sarah Weyland |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Jane Porrier's JointMemorandum Final Pre-Trial Memorandum | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Asbel Nunez, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Wells Landscaping, Inc. | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Darlene Thebaud, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Wells Landscaping, Inc. | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Wells Landscaping, Inc. (Defendant) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Tracking Order deadlines and Pre-Trial Conference (#13.0): ALLOWED Discovery extended to 9-6-22, Rule 56 filing deadline to 11-7-22. FPTC continued to 1-5-2023 @ 2PM. Dated: March 16, 2022 and notices mailed 3/17/22 Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/14/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendants Jane Porrier, Wells Landscaping, Inc., The Dolben Company, Inc., Woodview Apartments, LLC's Joint Motion to Extend Tracking Order Deadlines and Pretrial Conference | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/20/2021 12:10:38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.