Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dicenso, Vincent, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Belliveau, Esq., Jordan, Malone, Iii, Esq., John L, against Preferred Realty Corporation, Stone L'Oven Waban, Inc., represented by Geller, Esq., Lili K, Thebaud, Esq., Darlene, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Douglas H. Wilkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H. Wilkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: November 09, 2022Plaintiff Vincent Dicenso's Motion to Extend Time For Service of Process
Date: March 01, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/09/2020
Date: December 09, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 07, 2020Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties to the above-entitled action, pursuant to the provisions of Mass. R. Civ. P. 41 (a) (1) (ii), hereby stipulate that the said action be dismissed with prejudice, without costs and waiving all rights of appeal. Applies To: Dicenso, Vincent (Plaintiff); Stone L'Oven Waban, Inc. Doing Business as Stone L'Oven Pizza Company (Defendant); Preferred Realty Corporation (Defendant) | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 12/28/2022 | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 11/06/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Shannon Frison, Presiding
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 10/30/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled. Reported settled by Plaintiffs Counsel. Hon. Shannon Frison, Presiding
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Lili K Geller, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Stone L'Oven Waban, Inc. Doing Business as Stone L'Oven Pizza Company | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Darlene Thebaud, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Stone L'Oven Waban, Inc. Doing Business as Stone L'Oven Pizza Company | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: After hearing, the Court enters the following deadlines: Discovery Deadline October 31, 2022 Final Trial Conference Memo file or parties to appear September 29, 2023 Any Mediation to be completed August 31, 2023 Dated: April 27, 2022 and notices mailed 5/2/22 Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 11/06/2023 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Canceled | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Litigation Control Conference scheduled on: 04/27/2022 03:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Any Mediation to be completed by End of October 2022 Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.