Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carnahan, Alison, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Litsas, Esq., Helen G, against Abbott, Richard, Koosh, Allan, Santo, Frank, Wellesley Restaurant Group D B A The Local, Wynn, Iii, Thomas, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Diane C. Freniere presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane C. Freniere Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Plaintiff Alison Carnahan's Motion for Appointment Of Special Process Server
Date: September 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | REMOVED to the U.S. District Court By The Defendants, Wellesley Restaurant Group D/B/A The Local, Wynn, III, Thomas,Santo, Frank, Abbott, Richard Attorney Stephen T. Paterniti JACKSON LEWIS, P.C 75 PARK PLAZA, 4TH FLOOR BOSTON, MA 02116 | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Koosh, Allan: Service accepted by counsel; Per agreement between counsel, service was effected by email | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Santo, Frank: Service accepted by counsel; Per agreement between counsel, service was effected by email | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Wellesley Restaurant Group D/B/A The Local: Service accepted by counsel; Per agreement between counsel, service was effective by email. | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Abbott, Richard: Service accepted by counsel; Per agreement between counsel, service was effected by email | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Wynn, III, Thomas: Service accepted by counsel; Per agreement between counsel, service was effective by email. | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Special Process Server (#5.0): ALLOWED Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend time for Service of Process and Return of Service (#6.0): ALLOWED for the reasons state in the motion. Plt will have up to and including October 13, 2020 to complete service. Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Alison Carnahan's Motion for Appointment Of Special Process Server |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.