Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Olivier, Mimi, filed a(n) Actions Involving The State/Municipality case represented by Pro Se, against Department Of Correction, Agency Of The Commonwealth, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Edward P. Leibensperger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward P. Leibensperger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2018 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: February 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Department of Correction, Agency of The Commonwealth: Service made in hand; 2/22/18, 50 Maple Street, #3, Department of Corrections, Milford, MA 01757 | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Leibensperger, Hon. Edward P The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 03/01/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Disposed
Judge: Leibensperger, Edward P |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Dear Middlesex Superior Court; I am the Plaintiff in the above case. I do not feel comfortable proceeding without a lawyer and am filing for voluntary dismissal. | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mimi Oliver in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Mimi Olivier's Memorandum in support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 02/15/2018 | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Mimi Olivier's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency and request for waiver substitution of state payment of fees and costs filed without Supplemental affidavit ALLOWED, waived in full. The application is Denied with respect to the extra fees and costs indicated in the application, because I find that: Other: Denied, without prejudice, to reconsideration upon more specific requests. (Leibensperger, J.). (IMPOUNDED). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.